Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hunter Safety Courses - Application of Requirement and Establishment of Incentives Program
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire and Norman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 402
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a specified person to make, in order to procure a specified hunting license under specified circumstances, an affidavit that the person hunted before July 1, 1977, rather than that the person had a specified hunting license; limiting the exemption from the application of the Act to a person who purchases a nonresident 3-day license in the State to hunt wild waterfowl; Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to adopt regulations establishing incentives related to a hunter safety course for specified individuals; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/17/2016
Legislative Date
10/17/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Hunter Safety Courses - Incentives Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {324537/1 Adopted
Proceedings
13
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
13
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
15
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 402
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/17/2016 10/17/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Hunter Safety Courses - Incentives Program - Establishment
Senate 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {324537/1 Adopted 13
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 13
Text - Third - Hunter Safety Courses - Application of Requirement and Establishment of Incentives Program
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 15
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 17
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 67
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Returned Passed 63A
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 402
Text - Chapter - Hunter Safety Courses - Application of Requirement and Establishment of Incentives Program
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-301.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM