Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health – Vital Statistics – Veteran and Armed Services Member Suicide Reporting
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire, Young, Mathias, Eckardt, and Ready
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health to publish an annual report on the suicides of veterans and members currently serving in the armed services of the United States; limiting the information in the report to the age, sex, race or ethnicity, nature of service if known, and method of suicide of the veteran or armed services member; requiring the report to include aggregate information for the lesser of the previous 5 years or the total number of years for which information is available; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1159
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/17/2017
Legislative Date
9/17/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health - Vital Statistics - Veteran Suicide Reporting
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {917570/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/17/2017 9/17/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health - Vital Statistics - Veteran Suicide Reporting
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {917570/1 Adopted 20
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20
Text - Third - Health – Vital Statistics – Veteran and Armed Services Member Suicide Reporting
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 22
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 23
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 55
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Text - Chapter - Health – Vital Statistics – Veteran and Armed Services Member Suicide Reporting
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM