Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Small Businesses - State Minimum Wage Increase
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for certain wages paid by certain small businesses during the taxable year to certain minimum wage employees under certain circumstances; requiring the Maryland Department of Labor, on application by a small business, to issue a tax credit certificate in a certain amount; requiring the Department to report to the Comptroller, on or before January 31 each year, on the tax credit certificates issued; requiring the Department and the Comptroller to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2019
Legislative Date
10/30/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Credit for Small Businesses - State Minimum Wage Increase
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2020
Legislative Date
1/06/2020
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/30/2019 10/30/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Credit for Small Businesses - State Minimum Wage Increase
Senate 1/06/2020 1/06/2020 Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-751 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:41 AM