Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crime of Violence - Home Invasion
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Classifying the offense of home invasion as a crime of violence under specified provisions of law.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2015
Legislative Date
1/27/2015
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {142910/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2015 1/23/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2015 1/27/2015 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2015 2/16/2015 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 24
Senate 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Second Reading Passed 24
Senate 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 26
House 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 First Reading Judiciary 28
House 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Favorable with Amendments {142910/1 Report Adopted 68
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) 69
Senate 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 66
Senate 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66
Senate 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Passed Enrolled 66
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-401 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM