Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Mathias, and Ferguson
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the effective dates of specified regulations adopted under the Administrative Procedure Act.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1193
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0854 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
7/06/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {614139/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {116785/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 7/06/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/02/2016 2/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {614139/1 Report Adopted 15
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15
Senate 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 17
House 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 18
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Favorable with Amendments {116785/1 Report Adopted 54
House 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
House 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-0) 55
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM