Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Compensation
Sponsored by
Senator Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for specified military compensation to repeal a requirement that the compensation be attributable to military service of the individual outside the United States; repealing a specified limitation on the amount of the subtraction modification; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0192 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/18/2016
Legislative Date
10/18/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Compensation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/18/2016 10/18/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Compensation
Senate 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/18 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM