Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Sterile Compounding - Compliance by Nonresident Pharmacies and Repeal of Permit Requirement
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 5
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that specified entities hold a sterile compounding permit issued by the State Board of Pharmacy before engaging in activities relating to sterile compounding; repealing the requirement that a person that prepares and distributes sterile drug products into or within the State hold a specified permit; repealing the qualifications, fees, and other requirements for applying for a sterile compounding permit; making the Act an emergency measure; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0181
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 5
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2015 1/23/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/16/2015 2/16/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 23
Senate 2/16/2015 2/16/2015 Second Reading Passed 23
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 25
House 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 27
House 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 59
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 5
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101, 12-403, 12-4A-01 through 12-4A-12, 12-6C-03.2, 12-707 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM