Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A-7 Licenses - Surveillance System
Sponsored by
Senator Hayes
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending in Baltimore City the time during which the Board of License Commissioners may issue a Class A-7 license; altering the hours of operation for a holder of a Class A-7 license; requiring the holder of a Class A-7 license to install and operate a digital surveillance system on the licensed premises in accordance with regulations that the Board adopts; requiring the Board to adopt, in consultation with the Baltimore Police Department, digital surveillance regulations on or before August 15, 2020; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2019
Legislative Date
11/01/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2019 11/01/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A-7 Licenses - Surveillance System
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:41 AM