Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Institutions - Correctional Education Council - Mandatory Education Program Requirements
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor)
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from 120 to 240, the minimum number of calendar days that the Correctional Education Council must require certain inmates in correctional institutions to participate in a certain mandatory education program.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/17/2019
Legislative Date
9/17/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/20/2019
Legislative Date
12/20/2019
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary Ways and Means
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 5:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/17/2019 9/17/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/20/2019 12/20/2019 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Correctional Institutions - Correctional Education Council - Mandatory Education Program Requirements
Senate 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Favorable Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Second Reading Passed 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Correctional Institutions - Correctional Education Council - Mandatory Education Program Requirements
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Referred Judiciary Ways and Means 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 5:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:48 PM
Click to return on the top page