Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Selective Service Registration - Driver's License and Identification Card Applicants
Sponsored by
Senators Astle and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making specified provisions of law relating to the Motor Vehicle Administration's collection and electronic forwarding of Selective Service registration information gender-neutral and expanding their applicability to specified minors; repealing provisions relating to the refusal of an applicant for specified documents to consent to Selective Service registration; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0196
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2015
Legislative Date
1/27/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2015 1/23/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2015 1/27/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM