Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Citizens Committee for the Enhancement of Communities Surrounding Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Membership
Sponsored by
Senator DeGrange
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the designation of a specified certified noise zone that is used in determining the membership of the Citizens Committee for the Enhancement of Communities Surrounding Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0233
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
11/16/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
12
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
13
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 11/16/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/22/2016 1/25/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/26/2016 1/26/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 10
Senate 1/26/2016 1/26/2016 Second Reading Passed 10
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 12
House 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 13
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 56
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed 56
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 57
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-414, 5-806 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM