Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/23 at 2:15 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an insurer, with respect to private passenger motor vehicle insurance, from rating a risk based, in whole or in part, on the credit history of an applicant or insured in any manner; repealing certain provisions of law authorizing an insurer to use the credit history of an applicant or insured to rate a new policy of private passenger motor vehicle insurance subject to certain limitations and requirements; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1670
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0785 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/05/2017
Legislative Date
10/05/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 2:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/05/2017 10/05/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/23 at 2:15 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   27-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM