Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Members of the Command Staff of the Police Department - Residency Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to require certain members of the command staff of the Police Department of Baltimore City to reside in Baltimore City; requiring a certain local law, ordinance, or policy enacted or adopted by the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to include a certain waiver or exemption; and providing for the prospective application of a certain local law, ordinance, or policy enacted or adopted by the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0043 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2019
Legislative Date
11/01/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2020
Legislative Date
1/03/2020
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2019 11/01/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Baltimore City - Members of the Command Staff of the Police Department - Residency Requirements
Senate 1/03/2020 1/03/2020 Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-1, 16-2A )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:41 AM