Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Critical Area - Prosecution or Civil Suit for Certain Violations
Sponsored by
Senator Colburn
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a criminal prosecution or a suit for a civil penalty for a violation of specified local laws relating to environmental protection or natural resource conservation occurring in the Chesapeake Bay Critical Area in Talbot County to be brought within 3 years after the local authorities in fact knew or reasonably should have known of the violation; and applying the Act prospectively.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0058
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
10/18/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {764037/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
14
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 10/18/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/08/2014 1/08/2014 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments {764037/1 Report Adopted 12
Senate 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 12
Senate 1/28/2014 1/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 14
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 16
House 4/03/2014 4/03/2014 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM