Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Share of Intestate Estate Inherited by Surviving Spouse
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 627
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing the share of the intestate estate of a decedent inherited by a surviving spouse under specified circumstances from the first $15,000 to the first $40,000 plus one-half of the residue.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0735
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/28/2016
Legislative Date
10/28/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {388774/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 627
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/28/2016 10/28/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Share of Intestate Estate Inherited by Surviving Spouse
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {388774/1 Adopted 23
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts - Share of Intestate Estate Inherited by Surviving Spouse
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 25
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 28
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 57
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 627
Text - Chapter - Estates and Trusts - Share of Intestate Estate Inherited by Surviving Spouse
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM