Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Maternal Mental Health
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Benson, Kelley, and Klausmeier
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Maternal Mental Health; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 15, 2016; and terminating the Act after December 31, 2016.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0739
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {267579/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2015 1/23/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/23/2015 1/23/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/23/2015 1/23/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/23/2015 1/23/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {267579/1 Report Adopted 35
Senate 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 37
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 39
House 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 59
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM