Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Marine Contractors Licensing Board - Authority, Program Evaluation, and Termination
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Environment)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 513
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that the Marine Contractors Licensing Board is subject to the Maryland Program Evaluation Act; establishing that the Board is a unit in the Department of the Environment; authorizing the Board, by regulation, to establish certain license categories; requiring the Board to include a license category on each license issued by the Board; providing for the termination of the Board and certain provisions of law relating to the Board after July 1, 2031; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/17/2019
Legislative Date
9/17/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/02/2020
Legislative Date
1/02/2020
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 513
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/17/2019 9/17/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Environment - Marine Contractors Licensing Board - Authority, Program Evaluation, and Termination
Senate 1/02/2020 1/02/2020 Hearing 1/16 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Favorable Adopted 20
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Second Reading Passed 20
Text - Third - Environment - Marine Contractors Licensing Board - Authority, Program Evaluation, and Termination
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 21
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 22
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52A
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 513
Text - Chapter - Environment - Marine Contractors Licensing Board - Authority, Program Evaluation, and Termination
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-406, 17-101, 17-201, 17-305, 17-401, 17-501 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:48 PM