Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Maximum Alcohol Content
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Forehand, Montgomery, and King
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from selling at retail an alcoholic beverage with an alcohol content of 95% (190 proof) or more; and stating that a person who violates the provision is guilty of a misdemeanor and on conviction is subject to a fine not exceeding $1,000.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0359
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0905 Session: 2010 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
11/13/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 2:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {834634/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Special Order until 2/5 (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-10)
Proceedings
19
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {513293/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (99-35)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Motion Recede (Delegate Barkley) Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
House Recede
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (91-43)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 11/13/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/08/2014 1/08/2014 Hearing 1/23 at 2:45 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments {834634/1 Report Adopted 17
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 17
Senate 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Special Order until 2/5 (Senator Reilly) Adopted 18
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Third Reading Passed (37-10) 19
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 22
House 3/26/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Favorable with Amendments {513293/1 Report Adopted 58
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (99-35) 59
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 56
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Senate Requests House Recede 56
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Motion Recede (Delegate Barkley) Adopted 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 House Recede 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed (91-43) 68
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM