Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study a Program for Interest-Free Loans to STEM College Students in Maryland
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman and Jennings
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study a Program for Interest-Free Loans to STEM College Students in Maryland; providing for the composition, including one member each from the Senate and House of Delegates of Maryland, cochairs, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before June 30, 2016; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0538
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0523 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/03/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/03/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2015 1/23/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/26/2015 1/26/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/03/2015 2/03/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/03/2015 2/03/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Second Reading Passed 44
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 45A
House 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM