Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Resources - Transition Planning for Foster Youth
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Human Resources)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Lowering from 16 to 14 the age at which a juvenile court must determine, during a permanency planning hearing, the services needed to assist a child in transitioning from foster care to successful adulthood; requiring a juvenile court to determine the services needed to assist a 14-year old child transitioning from foster care to successful adulthood; requiring the Department of Human Resources to adopt regulations to define the term "successful adulthood" to conform with specified provisions of federal law; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2015
Legislative Date
9/24/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {172712/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2015 9/24/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 15
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Second Reading Passed 15
Senate 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 17
House 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judiciary 18
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments {172712/1 Report Adopted 60
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Passed Enrolled 61
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-326, 5-545 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM