Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicle Excise Tax Credit - Sunset - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Carter, Feldman, Rosapepe, Nathan-Pulliam, and Guzzone
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making the vehicle excise tax credit for the purchase of certain electric vehicles permanent; authorizing certain individuals or business entities that do not receive a tax credit in a certain fiscal year to claim the credit during the next fiscal year; requiring the Comptroller, each fiscal year, to transfer up to $2,400,000 from the Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund to the Transportation Trust Fund; codifying a limit of $3,000,000 per year on the total amount of credits allowed; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/17/2018
Legislative Date
9/17/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicle Excise Tax Credit - Sunset - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2019
Legislative Date
1/11/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/17/2018 9/17/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicle Excise Tax Credit - Sunset - Repeal
Senate 1/11/2019 1/11/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-20B-05 )
(   13-815 )
(   2014, 2017 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM