Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Limited Lines - Travel Insurance
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Astle, Brinkley, Feldman, Glassman, Kelley, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Mathias, Pugh, and Ramirez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 15
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering specified provisions of law relating to limited lines insurance for transportation tickets to relate instead to limited lines travel insurance; authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to issue a limited lines license to an individual or a business entity to sell travel insurance; requiring a limited lines travel insurance producer to require specified travel retailer employees or authorized representatives to receive specified instruction or training with specified required content; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0221
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
11/13/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/14/2014
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {937077/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 15
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 11/13/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/14/2014 1/14/2014 Hearing 1/22 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments {937077/1 Report Adopted 18
Senate 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18
Senate 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 20
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 23
House 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 59
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 59
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 60
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 15
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-101, 10-122, 10-130 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM