Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Destitute Adults - Extraordinary Medical Expenses for Developmental Disabilities and Civil Action
Sponsored by
Senators Reilly and DeGrange
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding the extraordinary medical expenses of a destitute adult child with a developmental disability to the support required from the destitute adult child's parent if the parent has or is able to earn sufficient means to provide the support; providing that a court may divide the support obligation for the extraordinary medical expenses of a destitute adult child with a developmental disability between the destitute adult child's parents in proportion to the parents' income; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0015
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/31/2016
Legislative Date
10/31/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/31/2016 10/31/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Family Law - Destitute Adults - Extraordinary Medical Expenses for Developmental Disabilities and Civil Action
Senate 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-101 through 13-103, 13-107, 13-110 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM