Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities and Licenses - Definitions
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Lottery and Gaming Control Agency)
Status
In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "video lottery facility" to include a casino for the purposes of the federal Bank Secrecy Act of 1970 and its related regulations; and altering the definitions of "video lottery facility" and "video lottery operation license" to include the operation of table games.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/17/2019
Legislative Date
9/17/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/19/2019
Legislative Date
12/19/2019
Action
Hearing 1/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities and Licenses - Definitions
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
3
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
3
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities and Licenses - Definitions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
5
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
6
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 9/17/2019 9/17/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 12/19/2019 12/19/2019 Hearing 1/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities and Licenses - Definitions
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 Favorable Adopted 3
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 Second Reading Passed 3
Text - Third - Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities and Licenses - Definitions
Senate 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 5
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Referred Ways and Means 6
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:41 AM