Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Welcome Home Vietnam Veterans Day
Sponsored by
Senators Astle, Conway, Pinsky, Bates, Kagan, Montgomery, Nathan-Pulliam, Rosapepe, Salling, Simonaire, Waugh, Young, Benson, Brochin, Cassilly, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, Edwards, Feldman, Ferguson, Gladden, Guzzone, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Muse, Norman, Peters, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Ready, Reilly, Serafini, and Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 2
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing March 30 as Welcome Home Vietnam Veterans Day in recognition of the service and sacrifice of Vietnam veterans from the State of Maryland; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1118
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {264738/1
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {264738/1
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Special Order until 2/12 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {264738/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {853529/1 Adopted
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 2
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2015 1/26/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2015 1/30/2015 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2015 2/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments {264738/1 19
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted 19
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Favorable with Amendments {264738/1 20
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Special Order until 2/12 (Senator Conway) Adopted 20
Senate 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Favorable with Amendments {264738/1 Report Adopted 21
Senate 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {853529/1 Adopted 21
Senate 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 21
Senate 2/16/2015 2/16/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 23
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 25
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 45A
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Second Reading Passed 45A
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 46
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Returned Passed 47
Post Passage 3/30/2015 3/30/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 2
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-402, 7-402 through 7-413 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM