Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Weekends - Emergency Preparedness Equipment
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/17 at 10:30 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Designating a certain weekend each year to be a tax-free weekend during which the sale of certain emergency preparedness equipment is exempt from the sales and use tax; requiring the Comptroller to publish a list on or before October 1, 2019, of emergency preparedness items eligible for the sales and use tax exemption during the tax-free weekends; authorizing the Comptroller to amend the list under certain circumstances; defining "emergency preparedness equipment"; and terminating the Act after June 30, 2024.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/27/2018
Legislative Date
9/27/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2019
Legislative Date
1/03/2019
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2019
Legislative Date
1/07/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2019
Legislative Date
1/07/2019
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 10:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/27/2018 9/27/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Weekends - Emergency Preparedness Equipment
Senate 1/03/2019 1/03/2019 Hearing 1/17 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 1/07/2019 1/07/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/07/2019 1/07/2019 Hearing 1/17 at 10:30 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-235 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM