Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Continuum of Care - Repeal of Termination Date
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Juvenile Services)
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the June 30, 2016, termination date of provisions of law authorizing the Department of Juvenile Services to transfer a child committed to residential placement from one facility to another facility under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2015
Legislative Date
10/20/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2016
Legislative Date
1/07/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2016
Legislative Date
1/07/2016
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2015 10/20/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/07/2016 1/07/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/07/2016 1/07/2016 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 3/10/2016 3/11/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2012, 2014 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM