Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Police Department - Reports on Funds
Sponsored by
Senators McCray, Carter, and Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Baltimore Police Department to submit, beginning in fiscal year 2020 and in each subsequent fiscal year, a report on the expenditure of grants received from the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention for community policing efforts to the Baltimore City Delegation to the General Assembly; requiring the Department to submit a half-year report for fiscal year 2019 on the expenditure of grants received from the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1259 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/09/2018
Legislative Date
10/09/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Police Department - Reports on Funds
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2019
Legislative Date
1/15/2019
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {938477/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Police Department - Reports on Funds
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Police Department - Reports on Funds
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/09/2018 10/09/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Baltimore City - Police Department - Reports on Funds
Senate 1/15/2019 1/15/2019 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {938477/1 Adopted 24
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Police Department - Reports on Funds
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 26
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Referred Appropriations 28
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 59
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Police Department - Reports on Funds
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-1201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM