Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Elevator Safety - Third-Party Inspectors - Certification
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "third-party qualified elevator inspector" to require certification by a nationally recognized safety organization accredited by the National Commission for Certifying Agencies or the American National Standards Institute that ensures that the certification requires testing and grading consistent with industry recognized criteria and that any renewal of certification requires continuing education.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2012
Legislative Date
10/11/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2013
Legislative Date
1/07/2013
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/22/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {417179/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
9
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/22/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
9
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
11
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
13
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {883696/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2012 10/11/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/07/2013 1/07/2013 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/18/2013 1/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/22/2013 1/22/2013 Favorable with Amendments {417179/1 Report Adopted 9
Senate 1/22/2013 1/22/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 9
Senate 1/24/2013 1/24/2013 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 11
House 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 13
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable with Amendments {883696/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendment 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-801 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM