Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Prohibition Against Smoking in Vehicle Containing Young Child
Sponsored by
Senators Forehand and Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the driver of a motor vehicle in which a person who is under the age of 8 years is a passenger from smoking a tobacco product or allowing a passenger to smoke in the motor vehicle; establishing a fine of up to $50 for a violation of the Act; specifying that the Act does not apply to a mobile home under specified circumstances; specifying that a violation of the Act is not a moving violation for purposes of the assessment of points; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0585
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0030 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
11/15/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 11/15/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/08/2014 1/08/2014 Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/31/2014 2/04/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1130, 27-115 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM