Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Second-Degree Murder - Penalty
Sponsored by
Senators Brochin and Mathias
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from 30 years to 40 years, the maximum term of imprisonment that may be imposed for the offense of second-degree murder.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0136 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2015
Legislative Date
1/27/2015
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2015 1/26/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2015 1/27/2015 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM