Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Management of eMaryland Marketplace
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Information Technology)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/09 at 1:45 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the Department of General Services has sole management responsibility for eMaryland Marketplace.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/25/2019
Legislative Date
9/25/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/19/2019
Legislative Date
12/19/2019
Action
Hearing 1/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Management of eMaryland Marketplace
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2020
Legislative Date
1/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2020
Legislative Date
1/03/2020
Action
Hearing 1/09 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/25/2019 9/25/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/19/2019 12/19/2019 Hearing 1/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Management of eMaryland Marketplace
Senate 1/03/2020 1/03/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/03/2020 1/03/2020 Hearing 1/09 at 1:45 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:41 AM