Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Aging - Aging and Disability Resource Center Program - Maryland Access Point
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Aging)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Adding to the duties of the Secretary of Aging; establishing the Aging and Disability Resource Center Program in the Department of Aging; designating the Program as the State's Aging and Disability Resource Center for purposes of the federal Older Americans Act; requiring the Department to administer, supervise, and coordinate the Program with the cooperation of other State agencies; requiring the Program to designate local Program offices and provide specified services and materials; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2012
Legislative Date
10/16/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2013
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2013
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2013
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/22/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {647371/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
9
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/22/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
9
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
11
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
13
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {426084/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2012 10/16/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/08/2013 1/08/2013 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/09/2013 1/09/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/09/2013 1/09/2013 Hearing 1/17 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/18/2013 1/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/22/2013 1/22/2013 Favorable with Amendments {647371/1 Report Adopted 9
Senate 1/22/2013 1/22/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 9
Senate 1/24/2013 1/24/2013 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 11
House 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations 13
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments {426084/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendments 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-1001 through 10-1004, 10-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM