Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Caroline County and Talbot County - Annual Financial Reports - Filing Date
Sponsored by
Senators Colburn and Hershey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 273
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering to December 31 the date by which Caroline County and Talbot County are required to file the counties' annual financial reports with the Department of Legislative Services.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0939
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
11/15/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 2:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {544138/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 273
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 11/15/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/08/2014 1/08/2014 Hearing 1/23 at 2:45 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments {544138/1 Report Adopted 17
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 17
Senate 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 18
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 21
House 3/27/2014 3/27/2014 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 273
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM