Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Sale or Distribution of Trichloroethylene - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, on or after January 1, 2021, a person from selling or distributing in commerce an aerosol degreaser or a spot cleaner for dry cleaning that contains trichloroethylene; and establishing that a person that violates the provision or any regulation adopted by the Secretary of Health to carry out the provision is guilty of a misdemeanor and subject to a fine not to exceed $1,000 for each violation.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0300
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1212 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/13/2018
Legislative Date
11/13/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/13/2018 11/13/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Health - Sale or Distribution of Trichloroethylene - Prohibition
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM