Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Delivery of Notices and Communications by Electronic Means - Authorized
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Information Technology)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 518
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a unit of State government to deliver certain notices and communications to an individual by electronic means, instead of by first-class mail, if the individual has consented to receive such notices or communications; providing that delivery of a certain notice or communication in a certain manner shall be considered equivalent to delivery by first-class mail; establishing certain requirements, procedures, and conditions for the delivery of a communication or notice by electronic means, instead of by first-class mail; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/25/2019
Legislative Date
9/25/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {944131/1
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {944131/1
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Senator Washington) Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Committee Amendment {944131/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Substitute Committee Amendment {734439/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 518
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/25/2019 9/25/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Government - Delivery of Notices and Communications by Electronic Means - Authorized
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments {944131/1 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Favorable with Amendments {944131/1 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Senator Washington) Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Favorable with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Committee Amendment {944131/1 Withdrawn 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Substitute Committee Amendment {734439/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Government - Delivery of Notices and Communications by Electronic Means - Authorized
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 518
Text - Chapter - State Government - Delivery of Notices and Communications by Electronic Means - Authorized
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:49 PM
Click to return on the top page