Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Notification, Disposition, and Reporting
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire and Peters
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Specifying that the purpose for which licensed funeral establishments and holders of certain permits are authorized to transfer unclaimed cremains of a veteran or an eligible dependent to a veterans service organization under certain circumstances is for the appropriate disposition of the cremains; requiring a funeral establishment or crematory to transfer certain cremains to the Department of Veterans Affairs for the purpose of the appropriate disposition of the cremains; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
7/13/2019
Legislative Date
7/13/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {714533/2 Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 7/13/2019 7/13/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Notification, Disposition, and Reporting
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {714533/2 Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Notification, Disposition, and Reporting
Senate 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:49 PM
Click to return on the top page