Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacists – Administration of Self–Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications
Sponsored by
Senators Young and Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a pharmacist who meets certain requirements to administer maintenance injectable medications to a patient under certain circumstances; prohibiting a pharmacist from administering an initial dose of a maintenance injectable medication under a certain provision of the Act except under certain circumstances; requiring the State Board of Pharmacy, by September 1, 2022, and in consultation with the State Board of Physicians and the State Board of Nursing, to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0135
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/14/2020
Legislative Date
9/14/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/14/2020 9/14/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Pharmacists – Administration of Self–Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/27/2021 2:21 PM
Click to return on the top page