Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - Siblings
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Brochin, Cassilly, Hough, Kelley, Lee, Muse, Norman, Ramirez, Ready, Smith, and Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 491
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the placement of more than two children in a treatment foster care home in order to place siblings together if the local department makes a written finding that placing the siblings together is in their best interests and that the siblings will not harm other children placed at the same treatment foster care home; and requiring the local department to notify the Administration of the placement.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1207
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/04/2016
Legislative Date
11/04/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - Siblings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {848473/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - Siblings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 491
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - Siblings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/04/2016 11/04/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - Siblings
Senate 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {848473/1 Adopted 42
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Text - Third - Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - Siblings
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Referred Judiciary 46
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 69
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 491
Text - Chapter - Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - Siblings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-525.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM