Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Use of Fog Lights When Windshield Wipers Operating - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senator Norman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 750
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the authority of a driver to use a vehicle's fog lights instead of the vehicle's headlamps during the continuous operation of the vehicle's windshield wipers under specified circumstances.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0494
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0232 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/07/2016
Legislative Date
11/07/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 750
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/07/2016 11/07/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Use of Fog Lights When Windshield Wipers Operating - Repeal
Senate 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Motor Vehicles - Use of Fog Lights When Windshield Wipers Operating - Repeal
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Returned Passed 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 750
Text - Chapter - Motor Vehicles - Use of Fog Lights When Windshield Wipers Operating - Repeal
(   22-201.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page