Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Rights
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Stating certain findings of the General Assembly related to the value of fishing and hunting to the cultural and social heritage and the economy of the State; and establishing that it is the intent of the General Assembly that residents of the State have a right to fish and to hunt subject to regulations and restrictions under laws that the General Assembly enacts.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
7/13/2019
Legislative Date
7/13/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Rights
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {734336/1 Adopted (43-1)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Rights
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-4)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 7/13/2019 7/13/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Rights
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Favorable with Amendments {734336/1 Adopted (43-1) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Rights
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (42-4) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
(   10-102, 4-103 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:49 PM
Click to return on the top page