Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Tourism Development Board - Destination Marketing Organization Officials - Voting Rights
Sponsored by
Senators Astle and Middleton
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Granting the destination marketing organization officials who are members of the Maryland Tourism Development Board specified voting rights.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0505
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/07/2016
Legislative Date
11/07/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2017
Legislative Date
1/09/2017
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
8
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
8
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
9
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
11
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-1)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/07/2016 11/07/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Tourism Development Board - Destination Marketing Organization Officials - Voting Rights
Senate 1/09/2017 1/09/2017 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 Hearing 1/17 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Favorable Adopted 8
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Second Reading Passed 8
Text - Third - Maryland Tourism Development Board - Destination Marketing Organization Officials - Voting Rights
Senate 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 9
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Referred Economic Matters 11
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-1) 57
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Text - Chapter - Maryland Tourism Development Board - Destination Marketing Organization Officials - Voting Rights
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-203, 4-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM