Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Campaign Finance - Contributions, Expenditures, or Donations by Foreign-Influenced Corporations or Foreign Principals
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting a foreign-influenced corporation from making a contribution to a campaign finance entity or making a donation to a person that makes independent expenditures or electioneering communications; prohibiting a foreign-influenced corporation or a foreign principal from making an independent expenditure or electioneering communication; requiring a corporation that makes a certain contribution, communication, or donation to file a certain statement with the State Board of Elections within 7 days; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0034
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/15/2019
Legislative Date
10/15/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/15/2019 10/15/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Campaign Finance - Contributions, Expenditures, or Donations by Foreign-Influenced Corporations or Foreign Principals
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:41 AM