Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Sponsored by
Senator Hayes
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing certain museums located in the State to claim title to property that is on permanent loan or that was loaned for a certain term that has expired by giving notice that the museum is terminating the loan of the property; authorizing a museum to take possession of certain property if the lender fails to respond to a notice provided by certified mail within 60 days; authorizing a museum to acquire a certain lien for the costs of certain conservation measures taken on the property; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0021
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0255 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/15/2019
Legislative Date
10/15/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2020
Legislative Date
1/03/2020
Action
Hearing 1/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/15/2019 10/15/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Senate 1/03/2020 1/03/2020 Hearing 1/09 at 2:15 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-801, 16-802, 17-401 through 17-408 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:41 AM