Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State and Local Government - Participation in Federal Immigration Enforcement
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that an official of State or local government is immune from criminal and civil liability for refusing to provide information to the federal government or another state for a certain purpose; authorizing the State to indemnify a certain official for certain costs or judgments; expressing the intent of the General Assembly to maintain community trust in Maryland governmental operations and law enforcement efforts by clarifying the parameters of State and local participation in federal immigration enforcement efforts; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0304
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1612 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/29/2020
Legislative Date
10/29/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 10/29/2020 10/29/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - State and Local Government - Participation in Federal Immigration Enforcement
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/26/2021 3:12 PM
Click to return on the top page