Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Ethics - Regulated Lobbyists - Certification to Authorize Lobbying and Electronic Filing of Registration
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Ethics Commission, State)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 19
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a specified regulated lobbyist to certify under oath or affirmation that the regulated lobbyist is authorized to engage in lobbying for a specified entity; providing for the contents of the certification; authorizing a regulated lobbyist registration to be filed electronically; requiring an electronically filed registration to include a specified certification made by an electronic signature; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
9/30/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 2:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {844435/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 19
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 9/30/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/08/2014 1/08/2014 Hearing 1/23 at 2:45 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments {844435/2 Report Adopted 17
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 17
Senate 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 18
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 21
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 61
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 19
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-703, 5-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM