Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Classwork and Assessment Involving Live and Dead Animals - Student Right of Refusal
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Failed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a student in a public school or nonpublic school to refuse to participate in or observe, in whole or in part, classwork or an assessment that includes specified actions conducted on a specified animal; authorizing a student to exercise a specified right of refusal on the day the classwork or assessment is scheduled to be performed; requiring a specified student to complete specified classwork or a specified assessment by an alternate educational method determined by a specified teacher for a specified purpose; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1556
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0901 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/06/2016
Legislative Date
10/06/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2017
Legislative Date
1/06/2017
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2017
Legislative Date
1/12/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2017
Legislative Date
1/12/2017
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {714131/1
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {714131/1 Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Rejected (13-30)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/06/2016 10/06/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Classwork and Assessment Involving Live and Dead Animals - Student Right of Refusal
Senate 1/06/2017 1/06/2017 Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/12/2017 1/12/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/12/2017 1/12/2017 Hearing 1/25 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments {714131/1 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {714131/1 Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Rejected (13-30) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
(   7-124 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page