Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems Licenses – Modifications
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the holder of an electronic nicotine delivery systems retailer license to make sales to consumers through the mail, a computer network, a telephonic network, or another electronic network; repealing an authorization relating to electronic nicotine delivery systems storage warehouses; authorizing the holder of an electronic nicotine delivery systems wholesaler distributor license or an electronic nicotine delivery systems wholesaler importer license to sell electronic nicotine delivery systems to vape shop vendors; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0047
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/25/2017
Legislative Date
10/25/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {197670/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems Licenses – Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-5)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems Licenses – Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/25/2017 10/25/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems Retailer License - Sales Through Mail or Electronic Network
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Hearing 1/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments {197670/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems Licenses – Modifications
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Referred Economic Matters 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (132-5) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Text - Chapter - Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems Licenses – Modifications
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page