Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Video Streaming and Recording (State Board of Elections Transparency Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 2:15 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Elections to make available to the public on the Internet live video streaming and archived video recordings of its open meetings; and requiring the State Board to make the video recording of a meeting available for a minimum of 4 years after the date of the meeting.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0169
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/26/2016
Legislative Date
9/26/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2017
Legislative Date
1/06/2017
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 2:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/26/2016 9/26/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Video Streaming and Recording (State Board of Elections Transparency Act)
Senate 1/06/2017 1/06/2017 Hearing 1/19 at 2:15 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM