Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Disclosure of Court Records
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Juvenile Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 669
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that a prohibition against the disclosure of court records pertaining to a certain child does not prohibit access to and confidential use of the court record by the Department of Human Services, local departments of social services, the Maryland Department of Health, or local health departments in coordination with the Department of Juvenile Services for purposes relevant to the provision of services or care; and requiring that certain disclosed records be kept confidential in accordance with certain laws.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/29/2017
Legislative Date
9/29/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Disclosure of Court Records
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2018
Legislative Date
1/04/2018
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {678578/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Juvenile Law - Disclosure of Court Records
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 669
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Juvenile Law - Disclosure of Court Records
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/29/2017 9/29/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Disclosure of Court Records
Senate 1/04/2018 1/04/2018 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {678578/1 Adopted 20
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20
Text - Third - Juvenile Law - Disclosure of Court Records
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 22
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Referred Judiciary 23
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 669
Text - Chapter - Juvenile Law - Disclosure of Court Records
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM